THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:15:10 AM
Woo, Glenn Malcolm
CPSO#:
60021
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Dec 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4047
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GLENN MALCOLM WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Oct 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1994 |