THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:36:53 AM
Cox, Ronald Henry
CPSO#:
60000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Meharry Medical College, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dusk Medical Centre
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6
Phone: (905) 451-9999
Fax: (905) 456-8998
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald H Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONALD HENRY COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1990 |