THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:41:51 AM
Leung, Henry
CPSO#:
59969
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 May 2022 |