THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:27:09 AM
Morel, Richard
CPSO#:
59962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: (613)945-1060
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD MOREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1989 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |