THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:15:30 PM
Jacques, Francois Henri
CPSO#:
59938
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
209 Gamelin
Gatineau QC J8Y1W2
Phone: (819) 777-2500
Fax: (819) 777-2502
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:23 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANCOIS HENRI JACQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACQUES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1989 |