THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:23:35 AM
Friedman, Gerald
CPSO#:
59934
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7330 Yonge Street
Suite 219
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 764-5590
Fax: (905) 764-6615
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GERALD FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1989 |