THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:24:48 PM
Geranmayegan, Amir Ali
CPSO#:
59924
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1525 Albion Road
Rexdale ON M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 740-0956
Fax: (416) 740-0958
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIR ALI GERANMAYEGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERANMAYEGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |