THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:37:33 AM
Goldsand, John Ira
CPSO#:
59905
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 4400
Fax: (416) 927-9984
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN IRA GOLDSAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 1989 |