THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:46:03 AM
Hemans, Clover Althea
CPSO#:
59859
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hemans-Osland, Clover Althea (used until: 14 Jun 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate Street
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. Hemans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLOVER ALTHEA HEMANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMANS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 May 1990 to 31 May 1990
EL - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Jan 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1991 to 31 Mar 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1989 |