THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:21:10 PM
Smith, Mark Alan
CPSO#:
59857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK ALAN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1992 |