THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:00:24 AM
Gagnon, Micheline Danis Marie
CPSO#:
59850
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building F329
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6124
Fax: (905) 521-6103
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELINE DANIS MARIE GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 1991 |