THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:33:02 AM
Mulzer, Paul Gerard George
CPSO#:
59849
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Anishnawbe Mushkiki
300-1260 Golf Links Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 623-0383
Fax: (807) 623-0135
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Mulzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL GERARD GEORGE MULZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULZER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |