THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:47:12 AM
Yau, Terrence Michael
CPSO#:
59842
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Apr 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N 470
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4074
Fax: (416) 340-4385
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRENCE MICHAEL YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 1996 |