THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:38:27 AM
Foley, Stephen Ronan
CPSO#:
59834
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: 905 389 4411 Ext. 42076
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:13 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN RONAN FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1991 |