THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:06:38 AM
Randall, James Patrick
CPSO#:
59820
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 722-3987
Fax: (613) 722-0902
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:24 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK RANDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 31 May 2005
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Nov 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1998 |