THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:32:25 AM
Singleton, John David
CPSO#:
59797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rainy River Medical Clinic
P O Box 278
113 4th Street
Rainy River ON P0W 1L0
Phone: (807) 852-3222
Fax: (807) 852-3990
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID SINGLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLETON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1989 |