THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 21:04:10 PM
Duarte, Anthony Clement
CPSO#:
59781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
117 East Kings Highway
UNC Rockingham Health Care
Emergency Department
Eden ON 27288
United States
Phone: 1 336 627 6320
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina
USA - Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CLEMENT DUARTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUARTE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2009 |