THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:32:40 AM
Haggarty, John Michael
CPSO#:
59777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
35 North Algoma St.
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 3434300 Ext. 4301
Fax: (807) 624-3401
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL HAGGARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGARTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1989 |