THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:06:02 AM
Quaggin, Susan Elizabeth
CPSO#:
59736
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northwestern Memorial Hospital
303 E. Superior Street
Chicago IL 60611
United States
Phone: (312) 503-1531
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Susan Quaggin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH QUAGGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAGGIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2006 |