THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:29:33 AM
Nianiaris, Nicholas
CPSO#:
59720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: (416) 462-3612
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:12 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS NIANIARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIANIARIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1989 |