THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:51:55 AM
Barr, David Bruce
CPSO#:
59692
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. Barr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 31, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Barr to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 31, 2023:
The College conducted investigations into Dr. Barr’s practice, including involving sexual abuse and professional misconduct allegations. In the face of the College’s investigations, Dr. Barr has agreed to resign from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)