THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:36:21 PM
Roher, Luna Soberano
CPSO#:
59678
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1206 Centre St.
Suite 302
Thornhill ON L4J 3M9
Phone: 905-709-1120
Fax: 905-709-1124
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUNA SOBERANO ROHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1992 to 14 Sep 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1993 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1992 |