THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:28:16 AM
Knight, Gregory John
CPSO#:
59668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Apr 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Apr 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5715
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1990 |