THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:37:45 PM
Banta, Gregory Allen
CPSO#:
59660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Colonel By Drive
Carling Campus, Building 9S.1
Directorate of Force Health Protect
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-901-9367
Fax: 613-901-1752
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY ALLEN BANTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2014 |