THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:56:44 AM
Hick, Anthony Michael Sampson
CPSO#:
59657
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4733
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY MICHAEL SAMPSON HICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1989 |