THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:42:42 PM
Cochrane, David Kenneth
CPSO#:
59630
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 3639
Fax: (705) 495-7945
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1989 |