THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:00:12 PM
Gupta, Milan Krishan
CPSO#:
59616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 495-4278
Fax: (905) 452-1052
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MILAN KRISHAN GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1989 |