THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:59:33 AM
Zaretsky, Ari Eliezer
CPSO#:
59611
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite FG-24A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5031
Fax: (416) 480-5070
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARI ELIEZER ZARETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARETSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1989 |