THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:01:37 PM
Whitney, Diane Katherine
CPSO#:
59603
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666
Fax: 613-548-6091
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records for
1139 Alloy Drive Suite 226 Thunder Bay P7B 6M8 effective July 31, 2023:
RSRS
St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Phone 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 29 Sep 2023
Instructions/Address:The contact information regarding the medical records for the practice that is closing in Thunder Bay 1139 Alloy Drive Ste 226 will be:
RSRS Canada
111 St. Regent Crecent South
Toronto ON M3J 1 Y6
1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 15 Jun 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANE KATHERINE WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1989 |