THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:58:09 PM
Mark, David Aloysius
CPSO#:
59595
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Mark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2022
Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston, Ontario
K7L 2V7
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 07 Sep 1993 to 31 Oct 1993
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |