THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:33:34 PM
Dervin, Geoffrey Francis
CPSO#:
59592
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Suite W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8081
Fax: (613) 737-8531
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY FRANCIS DERVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1989 |