THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:19:29 PM
Pietrobon, Gianfranco
CPSO#:
59588
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
56 Whitegate Crescent
Nepean ON N2J 4B6
Phone: (613) 440-4680
Fax: (343) 292-5111
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GIANFRANCO PIETROBON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIETROBON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2024 |