THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:10:25 PM
Kolyn, Donna Marie
CPSO#:
59578
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: Queen's University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 740-1625
Fax: (519) 740-0115
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE KOLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLYN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 1993 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 23, 2016, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Kolyn in respect of an incident that took place in December 2009.