THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:32:15 PM
Szendrey, James Joseph
CPSO#:
59577
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Brock Street North
Whitby ON L1N 4H5
Phone: (905) 668-3378
Fax: (905) 668-3807
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH SZENDREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENDREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1989 |