THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:20:16 PM
Wilkins, Kathryn Ruth
CPSO#:
59564
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-7427
Fax: (705) 725-7313
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:15 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN RUTH WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 1989 |