THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:30:58 AM
Bayley, Mark Theodore
CPSO#:
59561
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab Institute
Room 3-102-12
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3943
Fax: (416) 597-7112
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Bayley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 28 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:15 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK THEODORE BAYLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1989 |