THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:18:10 PM
Murray, Jodie
CPSO#:
59556
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
30 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Rumstein, Jodie (used until: 23 Jan 2008 )
Murray, Jodie (used until: 23 Nov 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Murray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit
Phone 1-888-781-9083 Fax 1-866-297-9338
Email [email protected]
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Instructions/Address:Please contact Docudavit Solution Inc - Tel: (416) 781-9083 or
1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 16 Feb 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |