THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:57:51 PM
Coutinho, Jude Jayaprakash Theo
CPSO#:
59527
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Health & Long Term Care
5700 Yonge Street
Fifth Floor
Toronto ON M2M 4K2
Phone: (416) 314-7530
Fax: (416) 314-7538
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDE JAYAPRAKASH THEO COUTINHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTINHO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |