THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:01:01 PM
Ting, Robert Hsiao-Ping
CPSO#:
59510
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
78 Corporate Drive
Unit 10
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 238
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:03 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT HSIAO-PING TING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1989 |