THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:20:40 AM
Boyd, Kerry Ellen
CPSO#:
59507
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Thurlow, Kerry Ellen (used until: 09 Jan 1994 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
325 Wellington Street North
McMaster Children's Hospital
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 72880
Fax: 9055217968
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KERRY ELLEN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1992 |