THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:31:29 AM
McMillan, David Richard
CPSO#:
59484
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1990 |