THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:58:55 AM
Mann, Miriam Elizabeth Siess
CPSO#:
59482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 May 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Seaforth Community Hospital |
Seaforth |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIRIAM ELIZABETH SIESS MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 1990 |