THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:16:54 AM
Semelhago, Lloyd Cajetan
CPSO#:
59470
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Health Sciences - General
c/o Operating Rooms - Cardiac Surge
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LLOYD CAJETAN SEMELHAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMELHAGO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 8 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1989 |