THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:50:54 AM
Lee, Jee-Yong John
CPSO#:
59466
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: JJ Lee Medicine Professsional Coporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:31 Dec 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEE-YONG JOHN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |