THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:14:25 AM
Best, Timothy John
CPSO#:
59419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
421 Bay Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 1X3
Phone: (705) 256-6012
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Aug 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN BEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEST is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Sep 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Sep 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1997 |