THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:00:09 AM
Mumford, David Arthur
CPSO#:
59393
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Mumford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1600 Jalna Avenue
Mississauga, Ontario
L5J1S7
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 May 2022 |