THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:41:09 AM
Dobrovolskis, Paul Stephan
CPSO#:
59366
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Lithuanian
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site |
Petrolia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHAN DOBROVOLSKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBROVOLSKIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2002 |