THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:44:48 AM
Crawford, William Francis
CPSO#:
59363
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 236
1186 Richards Street
Richards Landing ON P0R 1J0
Phone: 705-246-2477
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. William Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 30 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hornepayne Community Hospital |
Hornepayne |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Mar 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1997 |