THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:53:58 PM
Salonen, David Charles
CPSO#:
59332
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
3rd Floor
Room 3MC-422
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5616
Fax: (416) 603-5522
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES SALONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALONEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1989 |