THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:40:43 PM
Chow, Eva Wai Cheung
CPSO#:
59331
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
Room 1085
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32736
Fax: (416) 535-7199
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EVA WAI CHEUNG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1989 |